TN HB1553 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on October 10 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-15 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020
Pending: House Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, creates exceptions to the offense of open or concealed carrying of a firearm with the intent to go armed for any person legally in possession and not prohibited from possessing a firearm; converts existing defenses to be exceptions. - Amends TCA Title 10; Title 33; Title 38; Title 39; Title 40; Title 50 and Title 70.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, creates exceptions to the offense of open or concealed carrying of a firearm with the intent to go armed for any person legally in possession and not prohibited from possessing a firearm; converts existing defenses to be exceptions. - Amends TCA Title 10; Title 33; Title 38; Title 39; Title 40; Title 50 and Title 70.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-15HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020
2020-06-15HousePlaced behind the budget
2020-06-11HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020
2020-06-11HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2020-06-11HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2020-06-03HousePlaced on cal. Judiciary Committee for 6/8/2020
2020-06-02HouseAction def. in Judiciary Committee to 6/9/2020
2020-05-27HousePlaced on cal. Judiciary Committee for 6/2/2020
2020-05-27HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee
2020-05-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 5/27/2020
2020-03-17HouseMeeting Canceled
2020-03-11HousePlaced on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 3/17/2020
2020-03-10HouseAction Def. in s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee to 3/17/2020
2020-03-04HousePlaced on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 3/10/2020
2020-01-15HouseAssigned to s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee
2020-01-15HouseP2C, ref. to Judiciary
2020-01-14HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-10-10HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1566 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-16 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback