TN SB0714 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-18 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-18 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the alcoholic beverage commission to electronically report to members of the general assembly any manufacturer's license that has been suspended or revoked for violating the labeling requirements for Tennessee whiskey within 30 days of the suspension or revocation. - Amends TCA Section 57-2-106.
Title
As introduced, requires the alcoholic beverage commission to electronically report to members of the general assembly any manufacturer's license that has been suspended or revoked for violating the labeling requirements for Tennessee whiskey within 30 days of the suspension or revocation. - Amends TCA Section 57-2-106.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Green [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-18 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0637 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-01 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0714&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/SB0714.pdf |