TN HB0637 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-01 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-01 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the alcoholic beverage commission to electronically report to members of the general assembly any manufacturer's license that has been suspended or revoked for violating the labeling requirements for Tennessee whiskey within 30 days of the suspension or revocation. - Amends TCA Section 57-2-106.
Title
As introduced, requires the alcoholic beverage commission to electronically report to members of the general assembly any manufacturer's license that has been suspended or revoked for violating the labeling requirements for Tennessee whiskey within 30 days of the suspension or revocation. - Amends TCA Section 57-2-106.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-01 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 4/1/2015 |
2015-03-25 | House | Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 4/1/2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/25/2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 3/25/2015 |
2015-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/18/2015 |
2015-02-18 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2015-02-12 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2015-02-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-02-10 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0714 (Crossfiled) 2015-02-18 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0637&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB0637.pdf |