TN HB2588 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-27 - Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-27 - Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, makes mandatory, instead of permissive, the appointment of advocates to the statewide planning and policy council for the department of mental health and substance abuse services to represent children and persons affected by substance abuse. - Amends TCA Title 33.
Title
As introduced, makes mandatory, instead of permissive, the appointment of advocates to the statewide planning and policy council for the department of mental health and substance abuse services to represent children and persons affected by substance abuse. - Amends TCA Title 33.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2016-01-27 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2016-01-25 | House | P1C. |
2016-01-21 | House | Intro. |
2016-01-21 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2623 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-16 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2588&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB2588.pdf |