TN SB2623 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-16 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-16 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, makes mandatory, instead of permissive, the appointment of advocates to the statewide planning and policy council for the department of mental health and substance abuse services to represent children and persons affected by substance abuse. - Amends TCA Title 33.
Title
As introduced, makes mandatory, instead of permissive, the appointment of advocates to the statewide planning and policy council for the department of mental health and substance abuse services to represent children and persons affected by substance abuse. - Amends TCA Title 33.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/16/2016 |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2588 (Crossfiled) 2016-01-27 - Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB2623&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/SB2623.pdf |