TN HB2218 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Taken off notice for cal. in State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Taken off notice for cal. in State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, decrees "Tennessee Day of the Cowboy" to be observed on the fourth Saturday of July each year. - Amends TCA Title 15, Chapter 2.
Title
As introduced, decrees "Tennessee Day of the Cowboy" to be observed on the fourth Saturday of July each year. - Amends TCA Title 15, Chapter 2.
Sponsors
Rep. Sam Whitson [R] | Rep. Andy Holt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in State Government Committee |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/6/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2018-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-31 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2683 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-22 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.