TN SB2683 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, decrees "Tennessee Day of the Cowboy" to be observed on the fourth Saturday of July each year. - Amends TCA Title 15, Chapter 2.
Title
As introduced, decrees "Tennessee Day of the Cowboy" to be observed on the fourth Saturday of July each year. - Amends TCA Title 15, Chapter 2.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Bailey [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-13 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0583) |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 2/15/2018 |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/13/2018 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2218 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-06 - Taken off notice for cal. in State Government Committee