TN HB1895 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 929
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 929
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, clarifies definitions of "rule" and "policy" for rulemaking purposes and revises other administrative procedures. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 5.
Title
As enacted, clarifies definitions of "rule" and "policy" for rulemaking purposes and revises other administrative procedures. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 5.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 929 | |
2018-04-17 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-17 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2018-04-12 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/17/2018 |
2018-04-11 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/12/2018 |
2018-04-11 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-04-11 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/11/2018 |
2018-04-11 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/11/2018 |
2018-04-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2018-04-10 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-04-04 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/10/2018 |
2018-02-01 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-01-31 | House | P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2018-01-29 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-25 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1572 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-18 - Pub. Ch. 929