TN SB1572 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Pub. Ch. 929
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Pub. Ch. 929
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, clarifies definitions of "rule" and "policy" for rulemaking purposes and revises other administrative procedures. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 5.
Title
As enacted, clarifies definitions of "rule" and "policy" for rulemaking purposes and revises other administrative procedures. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 5.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] | Sen. John Stevens [R] | Sen. Brian Kelsey [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment # 3 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-21 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-21 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | Pub. Ch. 929 | |
2018-05-18 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2018 | |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2018-04-24 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 27, Nays 0 (Amendment 3 - HA1191) |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar calendar for 4/19/2018 |
2018-04-17 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2018-04-17 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 3 - HA1191) |
2018-04-17 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA1190) |
2018-04-17 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA1189) |
2018-04-17 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2018-04-05 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0927) |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0848) |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/4/2018 |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/5/2018 |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/29/2018 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 3/21/2018 |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1895 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 929