TN HB0734 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 148
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 148
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the board for licensing health care facilities to promulgate emergency rules no later than July 1, 2021, to permit persons who qualified as temporary nurse aides on or after the beginning date of the national public health emergency declared January 31, 2020, to become certified as nursing assistants in this state and be placed on the nurse aide registry. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 49; Title 63 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 49; Title 63 and Title 68, relative to nursing.
Sponsors
Rep. Robin Smith [R] | Rep. Esther Helton-Haynes [R] | Rep. Tim Rudd [R] | Rep. Sabi Kumar [R] |
Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 148 | |
2021-03-29 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-03-29 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-25 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/29/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/25/2021 |
2021-03-22 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/22/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Government Operations Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/17/2021 |
2021-03-10 | House | Action def. in Health Committee to 3/17/2021 |
2021-03-04 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/10/2021 |
2021-03-02 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2021-03-01 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/2/2021 |
2021-02-20 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2021-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee -- Government Operations for Review |
2021-02-10 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-10 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-09 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1266 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-21 - Effective date(s) 04/13/2021