TN SB1266 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Effective date(s) 04/13/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Effective date(s) 04/13/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the board for licensing health care facilities to promulgate emergency rules no later than July 1, 2021, to permit persons who qualified as temporary nurse aides on or after the beginning date of the national public health emergency declared January 31, 2020, to become certified as nursing assistants in this state and be placed on the nurse aide registry. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 49; Title 63 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 49; Title 63 and Title 68, relative to nursing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | Effective date(s) 04/13/2021 | |
2021-04-21 | Pub. Ch. 148 | |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2021-04-05 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-03-29 | House | Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2021-03-29 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2021-03-25 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/22/2021 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/17/2021 |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/17/2021 |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/10/2021 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/10/2021 |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/3/2021 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0734 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 148