MA H3589 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-05 - Reporting date extended to Tuesday April 30, 2024, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-05 - Reporting date extended to Tuesday April 30, 2024, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the legalization of certain natural plants and fungi. The Judiciary.
Title
Concerning the legalization of certain natural plants and fungi
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-05 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday April 30, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-06-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/13/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-03-30 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3589 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3589.pdf |