TN HB0159 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-22 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-22 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, extends the Suicide Prevention Act of 2018 indefinitely; requires the department of health to compile data on the medications that were prescribed to those dying from suicide; requires that a report be made to the health committee of the house of representatives and the health and welfare committee of the senate no later than June 30, 2020, and by June 30 every two years thereafter. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 33; Title 63; Title 68 and Chapter 1005 of the Public Acts of 2018.
Title
As introduced, extends the Suicide Prevention Act of 2018 indefinitely; requires the department of health to compile data on the medications that were prescribed to those dying from suicide; requires that a report be made to the health committee of the house of representatives and the health and welfare committee of the senate no later than June 30, 2020, and by June 30 every two years thereafter. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 33; Title 63; Title 68 and Chapter 1005 of the Public Acts of 2018.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-22 | House | Returned to the Clerk's Desk. |
2020-01-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 1/22/2020 |
2019-04-10 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to First Calendar of 2020 |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/10/2019 |
2019-04-03 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2019-03-26 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-12 | House | Action def. in Health Committee to 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/12/2019 |
2019-03-06 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2019-02-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Mental Health & Substance Abuse Subcommittee for 3/6/2019 |
2019-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Mental Health & Substance Abuse Subcommittee |
2019-01-31 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2019-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-01-28 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1465 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-30 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee