TN SB1465 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-30 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-30 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, extends the Suicide Prevention Act of 2018 indefinitely; requires the department of health to compile data on the medications that were prescribed to those dying from suicide; requires that a report be made to the health committee of the house of representatives and the health and welfare committee of the senate no later than June 30, 2020, and by June 30 every two years thereafter. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 33; Title 63; Title 68 and Chapter 1005 of the Public Acts of 2018.
Title
As introduced, extends the Suicide Prevention Act of 2018 indefinitely; requires the department of health to compile data on the medications that were prescribed to those dying from suicide; requires that a report be made to the health committee of the house of representatives and the health and welfare committee of the senate no later than June 30, 2020, and by June 30 every two years thereafter. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 33; Title 63; Title 68 and Chapter 1005 of the Public Acts of 2018.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Bailey [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-20 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/1/2019 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/30/2019 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/30/2019 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/29/2019 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/29/2019 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/25/2019 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/25/2019 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/24/2019 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/24/2019 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/20/2019 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0159 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-22 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.