SC H3698 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 42-6)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-10 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Taylor
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provide Liability Protections For A Limited Time Period For Health Care Providers And Businesses That Follow Public Health Guidance In Response To The Coronavirus Public Health Emergency; To State The Purposes Of This Joint Resolution To Protect Against Liability For Businesses During The Coronavirus Public Health Emergency; To Provide Definitions For Covered Entity, Covered Individual, Coronavirus, Coronavirus Claim, And Public Health Guidance; To State The Liability Protection For Covered Entities And Covered Individuals For Coronavirus Claims; To State That Defenses Are Cumulative; To Provide That The Provisions Of This Joint Resolution Are Severable; To Provide That In The Case Of A Conflict Of Law Between This Joint Resolution Any Other Law Of This State, The Provisions Of This Joint Resolution Shall Prevail, And To Provide For The Effective Date Of The Joint Resolution To Be Upon Approval By The Governor And For Its Provisions To Be Retroactive And Effective As Of March 13, 2020, The Date Upon Which The Governor Declared A Public Health Emergency Relating To Coronavirus.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Liability protection

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-10HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Taylor
2021-02-09HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: B.Newton
2021-02-02HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Taylor
2021-01-27HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Felder
2021-01-14HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2021-01-14HouseIntroduced and read first time

Same As/Similar To

H3597 (Similar To) 2021-02-10 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Forrest

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback