SC H3597 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-10 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Forrest
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-10 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Forrest
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enact The "south Carolina Covid-19 Liability Safe Harbor Act"; To Provide Liability Protections For A Limited Time Period For Health Care Providers And Businesses That Follow Public Health Guidance In Response To The Coronavirus Public Health Emergency; To State The Liability Protection For Covered Entities And Covered Individuals For Coronavirus Claims; To Provide That Defenses Are Cumulative; To Provide That The Provisions Of This Joint Resolution Are Severable; To Provide That, In The Case Of A Conflict Of Law Between This Joint Resolution And Any Other Law Of This State, The Provisions Of This Joint Resolution Shall Prevail; To Provide That The Provisions Of This Joint Resolution Are Retroactive And Effective As Of March 13, 2020; And To Define Necessary Terms.
Title
COVID-19 Liability Safe Harbor
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-10 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Forrest |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H3698 (Similar To) 2021-02-10 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Taylor
S0147 (Similar To) 2021-07-02 - Act No. 99
S0147 (Similar To) 2021-07-02 - Act No. 99
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3597&session=124&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/3597_20210112.htm |