SC S0147 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Enact The "south Carolina Covid-19 Liability Safe Harbor Act"; To Provide Liability Protections For A Limited Time Period For Health Care Providers And Businesses That Follow Public Health Guidance In Response To The Coronavirus Public Health Emergency; To State The Liability Protection For Covered Entities And Covered Individuals For Coronavirus Claims; To Provide That Defenses Are Cumulative; To Provide That The Provisions Of This Joint Resolution Are Severable; To Provide That, In The Case Of A Conflict Of Law Between This Joint Resolution And Any Other Law Of This State, The Provisions Of This Joint Resolution Shall Prevail; To Provide That The Provisions Of This Joint Resolution Are Retroactive And Effective As Of March 13, 2020; And To Define Necessary Terms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SC COVID-19 Liability Safe Harbor Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 40 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate: To Lay On The Table #13 (Y: 24 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: To Lay On The Table Judiciary Committee Amendment (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-02HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2021-03-02HouseIntroduced and read first time
2021-02-25SenateRoll call Ayes-40 Nays-3
2021-02-25SenateRead third time and sent to House
2021-02-25SenateAmended
2021-02-18SenateRead second time
2021-02-18SenateAmended
2021-02-18SenateCommittee Amendment Tabled
2021-02-17SenateSpecial order, set for February 17, 2021
2021-02-12 Scrivener's error corrected
2021-02-11SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
2021-01-13SenateReferred to Subcommittee: Malloy (ch), Young, Sabb, Senn, Talley
2021-01-12SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2021-01-12SenateIntroduced and read first time
2020-12-09SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2020-12-09SenatePrefiled

South Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=0147&session=124&summary=B
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/147_20201209.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/147_20210211.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/147_20210212.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/147_20210218.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/147_20210225.htm
Supplementhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/fiscalimpactstatements/S0147%202021-01-12%20introduced.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/fiscalimpactstatements/S0147%202021-02-11%20amended.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=18394
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=18478
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=18479

Bill Comments

feedback