RI S3050 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-10 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-10 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Transfer jurisdiction over estate investments from the superior court to the probate court.
Title
Collection And Management Of Decedent's Estates
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-09 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-10 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/09/2016) |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/31/2016) |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |