RI S2839 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides municipalities in the state with appropriate additional means to improve the health, living conditions, and welfare of their residents with expanded access to public educational, or child daycare centers, or public recreational facilities.
Title
Health And Educational Building Corporation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-21 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-27 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2022-06-27 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-21 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2022-06-19 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/21/2022) |
2022-06-15 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2022-06-11 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/15/2022) |
2022-05-26 | House | Referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/24/2022) |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/18/2022) |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/04/2022) |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |