RI S2550 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the state, general contractors, and construction managers from withholding more than five percent (5%) as a retainer with respect to any sewer, water main, or other public works construction contract.
Title
Contractors' Bonds
Sponsors
Sen. James Doyle [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-31 - Senate - Passage (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-08 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-06-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/08/2016) |
2016-06-01 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/31/2016) |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2016-05-16 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/18/2016) |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/27/2016) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |