RI S2437 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-21 - Senate passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-21 - Senate passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Making An Appropriation Of $2,000,000 To The Rhode Island Department Of Education (modernizes Expand Access And Provide Additional Funds To Adult Education Programs In The State, Create A Strategic Plan For Adult Education Establish Learning, Intake And Assessment Centers.)
Title
Joint Resolution Making An Appropriation Of $2,000,000 To The Rhode Island Department Of Education (modernizes Expand Access And Provide Additional Funds To Adult Education Programs In The State, Create A Strategic Plan For Adult Education Establish Learning, Intake And Assessment Centers.)
Sponsors
Sen. James Seveney [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Bridget Valverde [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] |
Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Meghan Kallman [D] | Sen. Kendra Anderson [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-21 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-21 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/21/2022) |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2022-06-15 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2022-06-10 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/16/2022) |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/02/2022) |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Committee transferred to Senate Finance |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |