RI S2309 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-10 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-10 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Excludes weekends and state holidays from the calculation of the 48 hour public notice requirement for a meeting of a public body.
Title
Open Meetings
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-09 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-10 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/09/2016) |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/31/2016) |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/23/2016) |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |