RI S2292 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-31 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-31 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Restricts the department of health's authority to impose and/or change the current mandated vaccinations.
Title
Offenses Pertaining To Schools
Sponsors
Sen. Leonidas Raptakis [D] | Sen. Nicholas Kettle [R] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Elaine Morgan [R] |
Sen. Paul Jabour [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-31 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-03-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/31/2016) |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/SenateText16/S2292.pdf |