RI S2222 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes and regulate peer-to-peer car sharing programs whereby existing car owners make their motor vehicles available for other individuals to use under a peer-to-peer program.
Title
Peer-to-peer Car Sharing Program
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan Pearson [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] | Sen. Dominick Ruggerio [D] | Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] |
Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-23 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 56 N: 12 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Senate - Passage (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate Committee on Finance: Be held for further study (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Senate - Passage (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate Committee on Finance: Be held for further study (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-23 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2022-06-23 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/23/2022) |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2022-06-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/22/2022) |
2022-06-21 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2022-06-17 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/21/2022) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/01/2022) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |