RI S0992 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-16 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on July 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-16 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Towns And Cities -- Redevelopment Projects
Title
An Act Relating To Towns And Cities -- Redevelopment Projects
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-16 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor |
2013-07-11 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2013-07-02 | House | House passed as amended in concurrence |
2013-07-02 | House | Placed on House Calendar (07/02/2013) |
2013-07-01 | House | Committee recommends passage as amended in concurrence |
2013-07-01 | House | Scheduled for consideration (07/01/2013) |
2013-06-28 | House | House voted to recommit to House Municipal Government |
2013-06-28 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/28/2013) |
2013-06-24 | House | Committee recommends passage as amended in concurrence |
2013-06-22 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/24/2013) |
2013-06-19 | House | Referred to House Municipal Government |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Senate passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/18/2013) |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2013-06-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/11/2013) |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |