RI S0862 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Creating A Behavioral Health And Firearms Safety Task Force To Review, And Make Recommendations For, Statutes Relating To Firearms And Behavioral Health Issues
Title
Joint Resolution Creating A Behavioral Health And Firearms Safety Task Force To Review, And Make Recommendations For, Statutes Relating To Firearms And Behavioral Health Issues
Sponsors
Sen. Catherine Rumsey [D] | Sen. Catherine Rumsey [D] | Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] | Sen. William Walaska [D] |
Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-11 | House | Signed by Governor |
2013-07-05 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Senate passed Sub B in concurrence |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (07/01/2013) |
2013-06-28 | House | House passed Sub B |
2013-06-28 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/28/2013) |
2013-06-28 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub B |
2013-06-28 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/27/2013) |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2013-06-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/25/2013) |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |