RI S0814 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-16 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-16 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Fish And Wildlife - Interstate Wildlife Violator Compact (would Adopt The Wildlife Violation Compact Act Which Recognizes Violations Of Hunting, Trapping And Fishing Laws Occurring In Other States As Violations In A Person's Home State.)
Title
An Act Relating To Fish And Wildlife - Interstate Wildlife Violator Compact (would Adopt The Wildlife Violation Compact Act Which Recognizes Violations Of Hunting, Trapping And Fishing Laws Occurring In Other States As Violations In A Person's Home State.)
Sponsors
Sen. Catherine Rumsey [D] | Sen. Catherine Rumsey [D] | Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] | Sen. Leonidas Raptakis [D] |
Sen. Paul Fogarty [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-16 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2013-07-11 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2013-06-26 | House | House passed Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2013-06-25 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/26/2013) |
2013-06-24 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2013-06-22 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/24/2013) |
2013-06-22 | House | Committee transferred to House Environment and Natural Resources |
2013-06-05 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/04/2013) |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/22/2013) |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/08/2013) |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |