RI S0609 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-17 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on July 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-17 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To State Affairs And Government -- Quasi-public Corporations Accountability And Transparency Act
Title
An Act Relating To State Affairs And Government -- Quasi-public Corporations Accountability And Transparency Act
Sponsors
Sen. James Sheehan [D] | Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] |
Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-17 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor |
2013-07-12 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2013-07-03 | House | House passed Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2013-07-03 | House | Placed on House Calendar (07/03/2013) |
2013-07-03 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2013-07-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (07/03/2013) |
2013-07-01 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-07-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (07/01/2013) |
2013-06-22 | House | Referred to House Corporations |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/20/2013) |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2013-06-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/13/2013) |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Committee heard |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/16/2013) |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |