RI S0232 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Includes in the practice of physical therapy the ordering of diagnostic imaging (x-ray imaging) to be performed by other health care professionals.
Title
Physical Therapists
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] | Sen. Roger Picard [D] | Sen. Walter Felag [D] |
Sen. Ana Quezada [D] | Sen. Alana DiMario [D] | Sen. Elaine Morgan [R] | Sen. Jessica de la Cruz [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-30 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-25 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-25 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-07 | House | Signed by Governor |
2021-07-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/30/2021) |
2021-06-25 | House | House passed Sub A |
2021-06-23 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/25/2021) |
2021-06-18 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2021-06-16 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2021-06-16 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/18/2021) |
2021-04-28 | House | Referred to House Health & Human Services |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (04/27/2021) |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (04/15/2021) |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/22/2021) |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |