RI S0192 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-30 - Referred to House Municipal Government
Pending: House Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-30 - Referred to House Municipal Government
Pending: House Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Towns And Cities - Indebtedness Of Towns And Cities: would increase the amount that the town of Coventry may borrow to finance a court judgment or settlement from five percent (5%) to ten percent (10%) of Coventry's most recently adopted municipal budget
Title
An Act Relating To Towns And Cities - Indebtedness Of Towns And Cities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-30 | Referred to House Municipal Government | |
2011-06-29 | Senate read and passed | |
2011-06-28 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2011-06-28 | Committee recommends passage | |
2011-06-28 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-05-19 | Committee heard | |
2011-05-19 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-02-09 | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://dirac.rilin.state.ri.us/BillStatus/WebClass1.ASP?WCI=BillStatus&WCE=ifrmBillStatus&WCU |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText11/SenateText11/S0192.pdf |