RI H7663 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-16 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-16 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expands the reporting requirement for abuse, neglect, or death of a child to include the governor, the director of the department of health, the speaker and the senate president and the posting of the report on the child advocate website.
Title
Abused & Neglected Children
Sponsors
Rep. Aaron Regunberg [D] | Rep. Christopher Blazejewski [D] | Rep. Edith Ajello [D] | Rep. Shelby Maldonado [D] |
Rep. Thomas Palangio [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-16 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-03-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/16/2016) |
2016-02-24 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/HouseText16/H7663.pdf |