RI H7562 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the RI small business minority lending set-aside program. Provides that approximately 24% of federal SSBCI funds would be set aside for small minority-owned businesses.
Title
Rhode Island Small Business Minority Lending Set-aside Program
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Almeida [D] | Rep. Kenneth Marshall [D] | Rep. John Carnevale [D] | Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] |
Rep. Grace Diaz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-01 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-04-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/01/2014) |
2014-03-28 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (04/01/2014) |
2014-03-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-02-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText14/HouseText14/H7562.pdf |