RI H7386 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
SEE TITLE 16 CHAPTER 97 -- THE RHODE ISLAND BOARD OF EDUCATION ACT) (Prevents state from reducing retirement benefits due teachers, by the amount they received for workers' compensation specific compensation and Medicare set aside allocations, thereby treating them the same way state and municipal employees are treated.
Title
Teachers' Retirement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-03-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/15/2022) |
2022-02-09 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7386.pdf |