RI H7245 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-03 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-03 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
ANIMALS AND ANIMAL HUSBANDRY -- DOGS - Increases the fines for dog ordinance violations in the town of Cumberland.
Title
Increases the fines for dog ordinance violations in the town of Cumberland.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-25 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House Committee on Municipal Government & Housing: Passage (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House Committee on Municipal Government & Housing: Passage (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-03 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2024-04-25 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (04/25/2024) |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/11/2024) |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |
2024-02-27 | House | House read and passed |
2024-02-09 | House | Placed on House Calendar (02/27/2024) |
2024-02-08 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2024-02-02 | House | Scheduled for consideration (02/08/2024) |
2024-02-01 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-01-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/01/2024) |
2024-01-19 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |