RI H7132 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires public utilities to provide prompt installation of new service and service upgrades, and requires the PUC to investigate complaints, and requires electric companies to provide written estimates for services over $500.
Title
Duties Of Utilities And Carriers
Sponsors
Rep. Deborah Ruggiero [D] | Rep. Kenneth Marshall [D] | Rep. Arthur Handy [D] | Rep. Shelby Maldonado [D] |
Rep. Daniel Mckiernan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-06 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-02-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/06/2018) |
2018-01-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7132.pdf |