RI H7106 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
LABOR AND LABOR RELATIONS -- LABOR RELATIONS ACT - Protects free speech/religious freedom/freedom of assembly rights in the workplace with a civil action to recover compensatory/punitive damages for employer discipline or discharge including attorneys' fees.
Title
Protects free speech/religious freedom/freedom of assembly rights in the workplace with a civil action to recover compensatory/punitive damages for employer discipline or discharge including attorneys' fees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-01-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/01/2024) |
2024-01-10 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7106.pdf |