MN SF4097 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Senate conferees Klein; Seeberger; Frentz; Dahms; Rasmusson
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Omnibus Commerce policy bill

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Omnibus Commerce policy bill

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-04-15 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 70 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - House - House: Neu Brindley - Amendment - S4097A14 (Y: 62 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-04-15 - House - House: 69 - Amendment to Neu Brindley Amendment - Nays (Y: 62 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-04-15 - House - House: Neu Brindley - Amendment - S4097A2 (Y: 61 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-04-15 - House - House: Neu Brindley - Amendment - S4097A1 (Y: 60 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 33 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-18SenateSenate conferees Klein; Seeberger; Frentz; Dahms; Rasmusson
2024-04-18SenateSenate not concur, conference committee of 5 requested
2024-04-18SenateReturned from House with amendment
2024-04-18HouseHouse conferees Stephenson, Kotyza-Witthuhn, Kraft, Cha, O'Driscoll
2024-04-18HouseHouse accedes, conference committee of 5 to be appointed
2024-04-18HouseSenate conferees Klein; Seeberger; Frentz; Dahms; Rasmusson
2024-04-18HouseSenate refuses to concur, conference committee of 5 requested
2024-04-15HouseBill was passed as amended
2024-04-15HouseThird reading as amended
2024-04-15HouseAmended
2024-04-11HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, April 15, 2024
2024-04-09HouseSecond reading
2024-04-09HouseBills not identical, SF substituted on General Register
2024-04-08HouseSenate file first reading, referred for comparison HF4077
2024-04-08HouseReceived from Senate
2024-04-04SenateThird reading Passed
2024-04-04SenateSpecial Order: Amended
2024-04-02SenateSecond reading
2024-04-02SenateComm report: To pass as amended
2024-02-22SenateReferred to Commerce and Consumer Protection
2024-02-22SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF4077 (Similar To) 2024-04-09 - HF indefinitely postponed

Minnesota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/bill.php?b=Senate&f=SF4097&ssn=0&y=2023
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=SF4097&version=0&session=ls93&session_year=2024&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=SF4097&version=1&session=ls93&session_year=2024&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=SF4097&version=2&session=ls93&session_year=2024&session_number=0&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.senate.mn/journals/gotopage?session=ls93&number=13412
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mn.gov/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=93&billnum=SF4097&session_number=0&year=2023&id=728
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mn.gov/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=93&billnum=SF4097&session_number=0&year=2023&id=729
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mn.gov/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=93&billnum=SF4097&session_number=0&year=2023&id=730
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mn.gov/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=93&billnum=SF4097&session_number=0&year=2023&id=731
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mn.gov/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=93&billnum=SF4097&session_number=0&year=2023&id=732

Bill Comments

feedback