AZ HB2210 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Occupational safety advisory committee; continuation
Title
Occupational safety advisory committee; continuation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - Senate Finance and Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - Senate Finance and Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Senate FICO Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-1-1-0) |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FICO Committee |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2024-02-29 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (47-12-0-0) |
2024-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2024-02-20 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-20 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-20 | House | House consent calendar |
2024-02-20 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-06 | House | House COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-1-0-1-0-0) |
2024-01-31 | House | House read second time |
2024-01-30 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-01-30 | House | Assigned to House COM Committee |
2024-01-30 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Continuation
Occupational Safety Advisory Committee
Occupational Safety And Health Advisory Committee
Purpose
Repeal
Retroactivity
State Government - Title 41
Occupational Safety Advisory Committee
Occupational Safety And Health Advisory Committee
Purpose
Repeal
Retroactivity
State Government - Title 41
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
41 | 3024.17 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 3032.17 | New Code | See Bill Text |