NJ S3308 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 20 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-28 - Senate Amendment (Voice) (Ruiz)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 20 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-28 - Senate Amendment (Voice) (Ruiz)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires electric public utilities to implement certain improvements to the interconnection process for certain grid supply solar facilities.
Title
Requires electric public utilities to implement certain improvements to the interconnection process for certain grid supply solar facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-20 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-28 | Senate | Senate Amendment (Voice) (Ruiz) |
2024-06-20 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4513 (Same As) 2024-06-06 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee