RI H7073 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a hardship relief fund for business owners showing financial hardship resulting from past due completion of road or bridge projects.
Title
Department Of Transportation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-10 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-05-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/10/2016) |
2016-01-07 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/HouseText16/H7073.pdf |