RI H6637 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Same as 21H-6049 --Establishes criteria for the criminal offense of sexual assault when the victim is in the custody of a peace officer/provides that a person convicted of custodial sexual assault would face imprisonment for not more than 3 years.
Title
Sexual Assault
Sponsors
Rep. Brianna Henries [D] | Rep. Leonela Felix [D] | Rep. Raymond Hull [D] | Rep. John Lombardi [D] |
Rep. Katherine Kazarian [D] | Rep. Liana Cassar [D] | Rep. Jose Batista [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-02-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/10/2022) |
2022-01-22 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (01/25/2022) |
2022-01-21 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2022-01-06 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H6637.pdf |