RI H6320 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-18 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-18 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Making An Appropriation To Pay Certain Claims
Title
Joint Resolution Making An Appropriation To Pay Certain Claims
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-18 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2013-07-10 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Senate passed as amended in concurrence |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (07/02/2013) |
2013-07-01 | House | House passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2013-07-01 | House | Placed on House Calendar (07/01/2013) |
2013-07-01 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2013-07-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (07/01/2013) |
2013-06-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H6320.pdf |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H6320aa.pdf |