RI H6212 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-16 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-16 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Authorizing The Stone Bridge Fire District To Issue General Obligation Bonds And/or Notes In An Amount Not To Exceed One Million Five Hundred Thousand Dollars ($1,500,000) To Finance Capital Improvements To Its Water System (would Authorize The Stone Bridge Fire District To Finance Capital Improvements To Its Water System Through The Issuance Of Not To Exceed One Million Five Hundred Thousand Dollars Bonds And/or Notes.)
Title
An Act Authorizing The Stone Bridge Fire District To Issue General Obligation Bonds And/or Notes In An Amount Not To Exceed One Million Five Hundred Thousand Dollars ($1,500,000) To Finance Capital Improvements To Its Water System (would Authorize The Stone Bridge Fire District To Finance Capital Improvements To Its Water System Through The Issuance Of Not To Exceed One Million Five Hundred Thousand Dollars Bonds And/or Notes.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-16 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2013-07-10 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2013-07-01 | House | Senate passed in concurrence |
2013-07-01 | House | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (07/01/2013) |
2013-06-28 | House | House read and passed |
2013-06-28 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/28/2013) |
2013-06-28 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2013-06-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/28/2013) |
2013-06-26 | House | Meeting postponed (06/26/2013) |
2013-06-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2013-06-06 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H6212.pdf |