RI H6164 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-16 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-16 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Labor And Labor Relations -- Workers' Compensation (would Amend Various Procedural Provisions In The General Laws Regarding Workers' Compensation Cases, Would Increase The Amount Paid For Burial Expenses, And Would Extend The Appropriation Of $2,000,000 By The State To The Uninsured Employer Fund To 2015)
Title
An Act Relating To Labor And Labor Relations -- Workers' Compensation (would Amend Various Procedural Provisions In The General Laws Regarding Workers' Compensation Cases, Would Increase The Amount Paid For Burial Expenses, And Would Extend The Appropriation Of $2,000,000 By The State To The Uninsured Employer Fund To 2015)
Sponsors
Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] | Rep. Scott Guthrie [D] | Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Christopher Blazejewski [D] |
Rep. Stephen Ucci [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-16 | House | Signed by Governor |
2013-07-10 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (07/01/2013) |
2013-06-28 | House | House passed Sub A |
2013-06-28 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/28/2013) |
2013-06-28 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2013-06-26 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/28/2013) |
2013-06-11 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-06-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/11/2013) |
2013-05-30 | House | Committee transferred to House Labor |
2013-05-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H6164.pdf |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H6164A.pdf |