RI H6101 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-19 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-19 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Taxation - Powers And Duties Of Fire Districts In The Town Of Coventry (would Provide Fire Districts Located Within The Town Of Coventry The Power To Adopt Tax Classification Rates, & Operate Under A Previous Fiscal Year's Budget Under Certain Circumstances. Also Subject Said Fire Districts To Audit Of Accounts And Installati)
Title
An Act Relating To Taxation - Powers And Duties Of Fire Districts In The Town Of Coventry (would Provide Fire Districts Located Within The Town Of Coventry The Power To Adopt Tax Classification Rates, & Operate Under A Previous Fiscal Year's Budget Under Certain Circumstances. Also Subject Said Fire Districts To Audit Of Accounts And Installati)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-19 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2013-07-11 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2013-07-03 | House | Senate passed in concurrence |
2013-07-03 | House | Placed on Senate Calendar (07/03/2013) |
2013-07-03 | House | House read and passed |
2013-07-03 | House | Placed on House Calendar (07/03/2013) |
2013-07-03 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2013-07-03 | House | Scheduled for consideration (07/03/2013) |
2013-05-23 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-05-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/23/2013) |
2013-05-09 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H6101.pdf |