RI H5480 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-16 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-16 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Agriculture And Forestry -- Right To Farm (would Include Arboriculture And The Production Of Wood Mulch In The Definition Of Agriculture Operations)
Title
An Act Relating To Agriculture And Forestry -- Right To Farm (would Include Arboriculture And The Production Of Wood Mulch In The Definition Of Agriculture Operations)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-16 | House | Signed by Governor |
2013-07-10 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (07/01/2013) |
2013-06-28 | House | House passed Sub A |
2013-06-28 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/28/2013) |
2013-06-28 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2013-06-28 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/28/2013) |
2013-04-25 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-04-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/25/2013) |
2013-04-09 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (04/11/2013) |
2013-04-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2013-02-14 | House | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H5480.pdf |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H5480A.pdf |