PA SB933 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 18 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-10-19 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: House Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 18 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-10-19 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: House Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 51 (Military Affairs) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in Department of Military Affairs, further providing for advisory councils for veterans' homes.
Title
In Department of Military Affairs, further providing for advisory councils for veterans' homes.
Sponsors
Sen. Doug Mastriano [R] | Sen. Daniel Laughlin [R] | Sen. Devlin Robinson [R] | Sen. Patrick Stefano [R] |
Sen. Lisa Baker [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-10-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 933 PN 1109, Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-10-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-20 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopt Amendment A02022 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-20 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-20 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopt Amendment A02022 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-20 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-19 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
2023-10-18 | House | In the House |
2023-10-18 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2023-10-16 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2023-10-02 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2023-10-02 | Senate | Second consideration |
2023-09-20 | Senate | First consideration |
2023-09-20 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2023-09-14 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |