PA SB531 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on October 3 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-10-03 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: House Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 3 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-10-03 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: House Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 51 (Military Affairs) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in State Veterans' Commission and Deputy Adjutant General for Veterans' Affairs, further providing for Veterans' Trust Fund.
Title
In State Veterans' Commission and Deputy Adjutant General for Veterans' Affairs, further providing for Veterans' Trust Fund.
Sponsors
Sen. Lisa Baker [R] | Sen. Michele Brooks [R] | Sen. Tracy Pennycuick [R] | Sen. Camera Bartolotta [R] |
Sen. Devlin Robinson [R] | Sen. James Brewster [D] | Sen. Jay Costa [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-10-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 531 PN 1098, Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-10-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 531 PN 508, 2023 A1379, BAKER Amendment No. A-1379 (Y: 35 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-19 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Committed (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 531 PN 508, 2023 A1379, BAKER Amendment No. A-1379 (Y: 35 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-19 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Committed (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-03 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
2023-10-03 | House | In the House |
2023-10-03 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (28-20) |
2023-10-02 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2023-09-18 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2023-09-18 | Senate | Second consideration, with amendments (35-10) |
2023-06-19 | Senate | First consideration |
2023-06-19 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |