PA HR399 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-8)
Status: Introduced on September 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-10-17 - Referred to RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-10-17 - Referred to RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution recognizing September 21, 2011, as "International Day of Peace" in Pennsylvania.
Title
Recognizing September 21, 2011, as "International Day of Peace" in Pennsylvania.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-09-27 - House - UNCONTESTED CALENDAR (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-17 | House | Referred to RULES |
2011-09-26 | House | INTRODUCED AS NONCONTROVERSIAL RESOLUTION UNDER RULE 35 |