OK SJR72 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Constitutional amendment; relating to use of public monies or property for sectarian or religious purposes. Ballot title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Constitutional amendment; relating to use of public monies or property for sectarian or religious purposes. Ballot title.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 65 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - House - House: CALL OF THE HOUSE (Y: 13 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [FAIL]
2016-04-06 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-26SenateFiled with Secretary of State
2016-04-26HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2016-04-26SenateEnrolled, to House
2016-04-25SenateReferred for enrollment
2016-04-21HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2016-04-21HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 65 Nays: 7
2016-04-21HouseGeneral Order
2016-04-07HouseCR; Do Pass Rules Committee
2016-03-14HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2016-03-08HouseFirst Reading
2016-03-08SenateEngrossed to House
2016-03-07SenateReferred for engrossment
2016-03-07SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 5
2016-03-07SenateTitle restored
2016-03-07SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2016-02-17SenateTitle stricken
2016-02-17SenateReported Do Pass as amended Rules committee; CR filed
2016-02-17Senatecoauthored by Brecheen
2016-02-08Senatecoauthored by Jordan (principal House author)
2016-02-03SenateSecond Reading referred to Rules
2016-02-01SenateAuthored by Senator Standridge
2016-02-01SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback